AZ HB2419 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Memorial; buffalo soldiers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Memorial; buffalo soldiers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-03-27SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-27SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-26SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-21SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-02-21SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2018-02-20SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-15SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-15HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2018-02-13HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-13HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-12HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-12HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-01HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2018-01-22HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-18HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-18HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2018-01-18HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70250
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2419p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2419h.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70250&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70250&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70250&billStatusActionId=180862&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70250&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70250&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70250&billStatusActionId=182782&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback