AZ HB2404 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Transmitted to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Initiatives; circulators; signature collection; contests

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Initiatives; circulators; signature collection; contests

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-23 - House of Representatives - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House of Representatives - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House of Representatives - Motion Motion to amend COW to exclude GOV amendment. passed by v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House of Representatives - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House of Representatives - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House of Representatives - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House of Representatives - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-23SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-03-23HouseHouse final reading , voting: , voting: (34-22-3-1)
2017-03-23HouseHouse minority caucusC
2017-03-23SenateGovernor Signed
2017-03-22HouseTransmit to House
2017-03-22SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0)
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-03-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-20SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-16SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2017-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2017-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-24SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-23HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (35-24-0-1)
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-1-0-0)
2017-02-16HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-13HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-09HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2017-02-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19102.01New CodeSee Bill Text
19111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19111.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19117Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19118Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19118.01New CodeSee Bill Text
19121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19121.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19122Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69410
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2404p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2404h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2404s.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.2404ugenti-rita.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.2404government.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.2404lovas.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.2404burges.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.2404jud.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.2404mendez937.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.2404mendez1114.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.2404quezada820.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.2404quezada824.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.2404quezada823.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69410&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69410&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69410&billStatusActionId=175697&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69410&billStatusActionId=175673&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69410&billStatusActionId=175674&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69410&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69410&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69410&billStatusActionId=176628&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69410&billStatusActionId=176633&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69410&billStatusActionId=176666&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69410&billStatusActionId=176673&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback