AZ HB2395 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 324
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Schools; illegal substances; notification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; illegal substances; notification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22SenateChapter 324
2017-05-22SenateGovernor Signed
2017-05-08SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-05-08HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (58-1-1-0)
2017-05-08HouseHouse concurs
2017-05-02HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2017-05-02HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2017-04-27HouseTransmit to House
2017-04-27SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0)
2017-04-10SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-04-05SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2017-03-28SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-28SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-27SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-23SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2017-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2017-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-24SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-23HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2017-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2017-02-16HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-15HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-15HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2017-02-13HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-1-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-06HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2017-02-02HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15186New CodeSee Bill Text
15843Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69398
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2395p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2395h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2395s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0324.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.2395boyer.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.2395education.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.23950240.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.2395ed.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.2395brophy mcgee0403.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69398&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69398&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69398&billStatusActionId=175639&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69398&billStatusActionId=175077&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69398&billStatusActionId=175286&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69398&billStatusActionId=175592&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69398&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69398&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69398&billStatusActionId=176835&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69398&billStatusActionId=176875&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69398&billStatusActionId=177290&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69398&billStatusActionId=177497&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69398&billStatusActionId=177519&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback