AZ HB2389 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Senate Conference members: BROPHY MCGEE has been replaced by PETERSEN
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Syringe access programs; authorization

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Syringe access programs; authorization

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Health Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11SenateSenate Conference members: BROPHY MCGEE has been replaced by PETERSEN
2018-04-04SenateSenate Conference members: BORRELLI, MENDEZ, PETERSEN
2018-04-04SenateSenate Conference appointed
2018-04-03HouseHouse Conference members: RIVERO, NAVARRETE, UDALL
2018-04-03HouseHouse Conference appointed
2018-04-03HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-03HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2018-03-29HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-29SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (22-8-0-0)
2018-03-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-27SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-27SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-26SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-14SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2018-02-28SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2018-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-23SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-22HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-4-0)
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-02-15HouseHouse HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-18HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-17HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-17HouseAssigned to House HEALTH Committee
2018-01-17HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
36791New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70220
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2389p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2389h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2389s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.2389health.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.2389borrelli.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2389gov.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70220&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70220&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70220&billStatusActionId=181268&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70220&billStatusActionId=181272&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70220&billStatusActionId=181541&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70220&billStatusActionId=181593&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70220&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70220&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70220&billStatusActionId=182731&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70220&billStatusActionId=182799&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback