AZ HB2389 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
ASRS; plan design; refunds
Title
ASRS; plan design; refunds
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Boone [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-08 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-08 | House final reading , voting: (48-7-5-0) | |
2010-04-08 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-06 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-06 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-05 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-01 | Senate third reading , voting: (26-0-4-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-30 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-30 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-29 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-2-0) | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-03 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-03 | House third reading , voting: (53-5-2-0) | |
2010-03-02 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-02 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-02 | House PERER Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to House PERER Committee | |
2010-01-26 | House read second time | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to House PERER Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Introduced in House and read first time |