AZ HB2383 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Organized retail theft task force
Title
Organized retail theft task force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (33-26-1-0) |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-17 | House | House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (11-2-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-10 | House | House JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-08 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-04 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2021-02-04 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Appropriations
Criminal Code - Title 13
Double Punishment
Organized Retail Theft Task Force
State Government - Title 41
Technical Correction
Criminal Code - Title 13
Double Punishment
Organized Retail Theft Task Force
State Government - Title 41
Technical Correction