AZ HB2383 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 302
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 302
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
HOV lanes; emergency vehicles
Title
HOV lanes; emergency vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Clodfelter [R] | Rep. David Cook [R] | Rep. Daniel Hernandez [D] | Rep. Kevin Payne [R] |
Rep. David Stringer [R] | Rep. Michelle Udall [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Senate | Chapter 302 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-04-30 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (34-23-3-0) |
2018-04-30 | House | House Conference adopted |
2018-04-24 | House | House Conference caucus date |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conference adopted |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conference caucus date |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conference members: WORSLEY, BURGES, CONTRERAS |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conference appointed |
2018-04-18 | House | House Conference report: That the House accept the Senate amendments and the bill be further amended. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conference members: SMITH has been replaced by BURGES |
2018-04-17 | House | House Conference members: CLODFELTER, ANDRADE, COOK |
2018-04-17 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2018-04-17 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2018-04-17 | House | House Conference appointed |
2018-03-29 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-20 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (33-26-1-0) |
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2018-02-07 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 737 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |