AZ HB2379 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Senate JUD Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Senate JUD Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Home detention; initial jail term
Title
Home detention; initial jail term
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Held |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-02-20 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-02-19 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-23-3-0) |
2015-02-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-05 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-1-0) |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to House MAPS Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |