AZ HB2379 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-17 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Special districts; secondary levy limits

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special districts; secondary levy limits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-17 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-17HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2014-02-17HouseHouse WM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-3-0-0-0)
2014-02-12HouseReferred to House WM Committee
2014-01-27HouseHouse WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-1-0)
2014-01-23HouseReferred to House WM Committee
2014-01-23HouseHouse read second time
2014-01-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2014-02-12HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2014-01-22HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2014-01-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback