AZ HB2378 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-09 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (12-18-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-09 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (12-18-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Officials; political action committee prohibition
Title
Officials; political action committee prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Representative Contreras to include the Terech Sub flr amendment Representative QuiƱonez 2nd RCV (Y: 28 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Representative Contreras to include the Terech Sub flr amendment Representative QuiƱonez 2nd RCV (Y: 28 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (12-18-0-0) |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Senate motion to reconsider third reading |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (13-16-1-0) |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (49-11-0-0) |
2023-02-21 | House | House motion to amend |
2023-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2023-02-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-25 | House | House MOE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-19 | House | House read second time |
2023-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-01-18 | House | Assigned to House MOE Committee |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Campaign Contributions And Expenses
Election Officers
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Officials
Political Action Committee Prohibition
Election Officers
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Officials
Political Action Committee Prohibition