AZ HB2377 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Chapter 43
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Chapter 43
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal sentencing; restoration of rights
Title
Criminal sentencing; restoration of rights
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | Chapter 43 | |
2016-03-17 | Governor Signed | |
2016-03-16 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-01-28 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-01-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-2-3-0) |
2016-01-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-01-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-01-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-01-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2016-01-19 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-0-0) |
2016-01-20 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2016-01-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |