AZ HB2376 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Agricultural land; foreign ownership; prohibition
Title
Agricultural land; foreign ownership; prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-02-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (43-17-0-0) |
2023-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-16 | House | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-19 | House | House read second time |
2023-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-01-18 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Agricultural Land
Foreign Ownership
Prohibited Leases Or Subleases
Prohibition
Public Lands - Title 37
State Land Administration
Foreign Ownership
Prohibited Leases Or Subleases
Prohibition
Public Lands - Title 37
State Land Administration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 240 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 292 | New Code | See Bill Text |