AZ HB2375 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Senate TAT Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Senate TAT Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Empowering today's youth special plates.
Title
Empowering today's youth special plates.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Dunn [R] | Rep. David Cook [R] | Rep. Joanne Osborne [R] | Rep. Kevin Payne [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (46-14-0-0) |
2021-02-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-03 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-3-0-0) |
2021-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-26 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2021-01-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 2351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2469 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6993 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |