AZ HB2374 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

State lake improvement fund; appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State lake improvement fund; appropriation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-21SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0)
2023-03-09SenateSenate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2023-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2023-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2023-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2023-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate NREW Committee
2023-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2023-02-23SenateTransmit to Senate
2023-02-22HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (53-7-0-0)
2023-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2023-02-21HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-21HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-21HouseHouse consent calendar
2023-02-21HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2023-02-15HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (14-0-1-0-0-0)
2023-02-14HouseHouse NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-2-1-0-0)
2023-01-19HouseHouse read second time
2023-01-18HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2023-01-18HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2023-01-18HouseAssigned to House NREW Committee
2023-01-18HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41511.21Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5382Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/78483
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/hb2374p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/hb2374h.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/503788
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/504002
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/505036
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/505396
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/506247
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/506364
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78483&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78483&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78483&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78483&billStatusActionId=216025&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78483&billStatusActionId=216081&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78483&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78483&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4

Bill Comments

feedback