AZ HB2374 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Chapter 171
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Additional wagering facilities; cap; removal

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Additional wagering facilities; cap; removal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-05SenateChapter 171
2021-04-05SenateGovernor Signed
2021-03-30SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-03-29HouseTransmit to House
2021-03-29SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (27-3-0-0)
2021-03-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-03-16SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-16SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-15SenateSenate consent calendar
2021-03-15SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-10SenateSenate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0)
2021-03-03SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate COM Committee
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-02-24SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-02-23HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-1-1-0)
2021-02-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-22HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2021-02-22HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-15HouseHouse LARA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-27HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-26HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-26HouseAssigned to House LARA Committee
2021-01-26HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5118Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74906
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2374p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2374h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0171.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/h.2374dunn.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/h.2374land agriculture rural affairs.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484005
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485001
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485346
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486682
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486795
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488421
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74906&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74906&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74906&billStatusActionId=201246&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74906&billStatusActionId=201422&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74906&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74906&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74906&billStatusActionId=203398&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74906&billStatusActionId=203427&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback