AZ HB2371 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - Chapter 286
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Mobile food vendors; state licensure

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mobile food vendors; state licensure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-14SenateChapter 286
2018-05-14SenateGovernor Signed
2018-05-03SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-05-03SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-0-2-0)
2018-04-30HouseHouse Conference adopted
2018-04-30SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-30HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (57-0-3-0)
2018-04-24HouseHouse Conference caucus date
2018-04-24SenateSenate Conference adopted
2018-04-18SenateSenate Conference caucus date
2018-04-17HouseHouse Conference report: That the House accept the Senate amendments and the bill be further amended.
2018-04-16SenateSenate Conference members: CONTRERAS has been replaced by MENDEZ
2018-04-11SenateSenate Conference members: FARNSWORTH D, FANN, MENDEZ
2018-04-11SenateSenate Conference appointed
2018-04-11HouseHouse Conference members: PAYNE, CHÁVEZ, CLODFELTER
2018-04-11HouseHouse Conference appointed
2018-04-10HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-10HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-05HouseTransmit to House
2018-04-05SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (21-7-2-0)
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2018-03-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2018-03-20SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-19SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-14SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-03-12SenateSenate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2018-02-28SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2018-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-23SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-22HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (45-11-4-0)
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-02-12HouseHouse MVRA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-18HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-17HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-17HouseAssigned to House MVRA Committee
2018-01-17HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11269.20New CodeSee Bill Text
41626New CodeSee Bill Text
425074Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
426015New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70177
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2371p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2371h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2371s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2371c.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0286.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.2371finchem.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.2371military veterans and regulatory affairs.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.23710404.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2371comps.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.23711155.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2371fin.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2371gray0402.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/ccamendments/53leg/2r/h.2371fcc.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70177&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70177&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70177&billStatusActionId=181540&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70177&billStatusActionId=181645&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70177&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70177&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70177&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70177&billStatusActionId=182742&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70177&billStatusActionId=182790&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70177&billStatusActionId=182923&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70177&billStatusActionId=183016&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70177&billStatusActionId=183417&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70177&billStatusActionId=183648&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback