AZ HB2368 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Chapter 295
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Chapter 295
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Oxygenated fuel standards; formula.
Title
Oxygenated fuel standards; formula.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Senate | Chapter 295 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-05-08 | House | House concurs |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-05-08 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (39-20-1-0) |
2017-04-25 | House | House concurs |
2017-04-04 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2017-04-04 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2017-03-28 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate TRANSIT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (47-11-2-0) |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-08 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-01 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-31 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 3491 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 3493 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |