AZ HB2365 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Chapter 194
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Chapter 194
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Political candidates; address confidentiality
Title
Political candidates; address confidentiality
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Payne [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | Senate | Chapter 194 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2021-04-07 | House | House concurs |
2021-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2021-03-31 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2021-03-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-3-1-0) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (40-20-0-0) |
2021-02-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-03 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-4-0-1-0-0) |
2021-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-26 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2021-01-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Actual Residence Address (h)
Address Confidentiality (h)
Description Of Place Of Residence (h)
Elections And Electors (h)
Elections And Electors - Title 16 (h)
Left Lane
Minimum Vehicle Speed
Political Candidates (h)
Post Office Address (h)
Post Office Box (h)
Private Mail Box Address (h)
Speed Limits
Speed Restrictions
Strike Everything Amendment (h)
Transportation - Title 28
Address Confidentiality (h)
Description Of Place Of Residence (h)
Elections And Electors (h)
Elections And Electors - Title 16 (h)
Left Lane
Minimum Vehicle Speed
Political Candidates (h)
Post Office Address (h)
Post Office Box (h)
Private Mail Box Address (h)
Speed Limits
Speed Restrictions
Strike Everything Amendment (h)
Transportation - Title 28