AZ HB2364 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Election law amendments
Title
Election law amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House - Representative Salman to exclude the Townsend flr amendemt - failed by RCV (Y: 29 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House - Representative Salman to exclude the Townsend flr amendemt - failed by RCV (Y: 29 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2020-03-04 | House | House motion to amend |
2020-03-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-01-28 | House | House ELECT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned to House ELECT Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Board Of Supervisors
County Recorder
Early Voting
Education - Title 15
Elections
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Emergency Clause
County Recorder
Early Voting
Education - Title 15
Elections
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Emergency Clause
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 1442 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 424 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 166 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 250 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 410 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 449 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 464 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 558.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 822 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |