AZ HB2361 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Chapter 165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Tourism; sporting event; promotion; marketing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tourism; sporting event; promotion; marketing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateChapter 165
2019-05-03SenateGovernor Signed
2019-04-29SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-04-29HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (56-3-1-0)
2019-04-29HouseHouse concurs
2019-04-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2019-04-23HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2019-04-22HouseTransmit to House
2019-04-22SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0)
2019-04-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-04-18SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2019-04-16SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-16SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-15SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-04-02SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0)
2019-03-27SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2019-03-27SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-06SenateSenate read second time
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-03-04SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-03-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (57-2-1-0)
2019-02-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2019-02-14HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2019-02-12HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-12HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-11HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-06HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-01-29HouseHouse read second time
2019-01-28HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-01-28HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2019-01-28HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
122703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
133419Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
13701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411604.10Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71458
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2361p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2361h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2361s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0165.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.2361gowan.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.2361gowan1.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2361approp.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2361floorlivingston.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71458&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71458&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71458&billStatusActionId=186531&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71458&billStatusActionId=187158&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71458&billStatusActionId=187480&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71458&billStatusActionId=187534&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71458&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71458&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71458&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71458&billStatusActionId=189016&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71458&billStatusActionId=189057&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71458&billStatusActionId=189064&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71458&billStatusActionId=189186&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71458&billStatusActionId=189188&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback