AZ HB2359 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Transmit to House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Election equipment; access; locks

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election equipment; access; locks

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseTransmit to House
2021-04-13SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2021-04-05SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-03-30SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-30SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-29SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-22SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2021-03-04SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-03SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-03SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2021-03-03SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-03-01SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-03-01HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (52-0-8-0)
2021-03-01HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-25HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-25HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-24HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-03HouseHouse GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-27HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-26HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-26HouseAssigned to House GE Committee
2021-01-26HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16570Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74886
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2359p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2359h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2359s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.23590902.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.2359gov.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/482469
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/482968
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486117
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487395
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487855
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488866
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74886&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74886&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74886&billStatusActionId=201947&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74886&billStatusActionId=201958&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74886&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74886&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74886&billStatusActionId=203527&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74886&billStatusActionId=203683&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback