AZ HB2359 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-3-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Income tax; charitable deductions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax; charitable deductions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-3-0)
2019-03-04SenateSenate read second time
2019-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2019-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-02-27SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-02-26HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (38-21-1-0)
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-25HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0-0)
2019-02-13HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-2-0-0)
2019-02-06HouseHouse WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
2019-01-30HouseHouse read second time
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2019-01-29HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
431041Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71456
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2359p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2359h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2359epstein.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2359toma.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.2359ways & means.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.2359mesnard.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71456&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71456&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71456&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71456&billStatusActionId=187049&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71456&billStatusActionId=187088&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71456&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments 750

feedback