AZ HB2357 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Senate GOV Committee action: Discussed and Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Attorney general; voter fraud; subpoenas

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Attorney general; voter fraud; subpoenas

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP ON RECON) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-22SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Discussed and Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-09SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-08SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-08SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2021-03-08SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-03-04SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-03-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0)
2021-02-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-02-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-03HouseHouse GE Committee action: Do pass on reconsideration, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-03HouseHouse GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-5-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-27HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-26HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-26HouseAssigned to House GE Committee
2021-01-26HouseAssigned to House GE Committee
2021-01-26HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41192Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74884
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2357p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2357h.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/482467
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/482967
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485746
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487388
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74884&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74884&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74884&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74884&billStatusActionId=201775&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74884&billStatusActionId=202772&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74884&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments 750

feedback