AZ HB2355 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - House third reading FAILED voting: (25-34-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - House third reading FAILED voting: (25-34-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Animal abuser registration; penalties
Title
Animal abuser registration; penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - Motion Representative Kavanagh motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(O) House Bill 2355 be referred to an Additional Committee of the Whole. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - Motion Representative Kavanagh motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(O) House Bill 2355 be referred to an Additional Committee of the Whole. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (25-34-1-0) |
2021-02-24 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-24 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-23 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2021-02-23 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (28-31-1-0) |
2021-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-10 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-26 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2021-01-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |