AZ HB2346 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Chapter 210 RFEIR
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Chapter 210 RFEIR
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Medical marijuana; reimbursement; no requirement
Title
Medical marijuana; reimbursement; no requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-06 | Chapter 210 RFEIR | |
2015-04-06 | Governor Signed | |
2015-03-31 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-3-1-0) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate CWD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate CWD Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CWD Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-02-20 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-02-19 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-3-3-0) |
2015-02-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | House INS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to House INS Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | Assigned to House INS Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |