AZ HB2343 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Early voting; identification required

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early voting; identification required

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2020-02-25HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-25HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-25HouseHouse consent calendar
2020-02-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-02-18HouseHouse ELECT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-27HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-22HouseAssigned to House ELECT Committee
2020-01-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16548Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback