AZ HB2339 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - House final reading FAILED, voting: (18-37-5-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Bad debt deduction; retail TPT

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bad debt deduction; retail TPT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10HouseHouse final reading FAILED, voting: (18-37-5-0)
2017-05-10HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2017-05-10HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2017-05-10HouseHouse concurs
2017-05-09HouseTransmit to House
2017-05-09SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (25-3-2-0)
2017-05-09SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-05-09SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-05-09SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-05-09SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-28SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-1-0)
2017-03-16SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2017-02-28SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2017-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2017-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-23SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-22HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (53-6-1-0)
2017-02-20HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-02-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-08HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-02-02HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0-0-0)
2017-01-30HouseHouse read second time
2017-01-26HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-26HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2017-01-26HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2017-01-26HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16250Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68956
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2339p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2339h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2339s.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.23391028.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.23390829.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.2339approp.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.2339rules.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.2339lesko1114.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68956&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68956&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68956&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68956&billStatusActionId=175468&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68956&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68956&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68956&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#5
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68956&billStatusActionId=177548&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68956&billStatusActionId=177568&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68956&billStatusActionId=177609&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68956&billStatusActionId=177646&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback