AZ HB2339 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Firearms; permit holders; public places
Title
Firearms; permit holders; public places
Sponsors
Rep. Brenda Barton [R] | Rep. Carl Seel [R] | Sen. Steve Smith [R] | Sen. Rick Murphy [R] |
Rep. Darin Mitchell [R] | Rep. Steve Montenegro [R] | Sen. Warren Petersen [R] | Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Sen. Chester Crandell [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Governor Vetoed | |
2014-04-16 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-1-0) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-12 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-22-4-0) |
2014-03-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-03-11 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-11 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-10 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-20 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0-0) |
2014-02-04 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-03 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2014-02-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |