AZ HB2338 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-28 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

AHCCCS; preventive dental care

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AHCCCS; preventive dental care

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-28SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0)
2023-03-21SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2023-03-15SenateSenate read second time
2023-03-14SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2023-03-14SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2023-03-14SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2023-03-14SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2023-03-08SenateTransmit to Senate
2023-03-08HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (43-15-2-0)
2023-03-01HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2023-02-27HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-27HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-27HouseHouse consent calendar
2023-02-27HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2023-02-20HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-1-0-1-0-0)
2023-02-16HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0)
2023-01-30HouseHouse read second time
2023-01-26HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2023-01-26HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2023-01-26HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2023-01-26HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
362907Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/78453
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/hb2338p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/hb2338h.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/503023
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/504326
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/504446
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/504790
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/504961
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/505914
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/506878
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/507020
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78453&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78453&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78453&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78453&billStatusActionId=216925&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78453&billStatusActionId=217445&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78453&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78453&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4

Bill Comments

feedback