AZ HB2337 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Senate FIN Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-4-2-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Senate FIN Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-4-2-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Deferred retirement optional plan; reinstatement
Title
Deferred retirement optional plan; reinstatement
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Payne [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-4-2-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0) |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-15 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-15 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-14 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-02-09 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-24 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Deferred Retirement
Option Plan
Psprs (see Also: Public Safety Personnel Retirement System)
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Public Safety Personnel Retirement System (psprs)
Reinstatement
Option Plan
Psprs (see Also: Public Safety Personnel Retirement System)
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Public Safety Personnel Retirement System (psprs)
Reinstatement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 844.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 844.03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 844.05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |