AZ HB2334 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Chapter 240
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Chapter 240
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor omnibus
Title
Liquor omnibus
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Chapter 240 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-04-11 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (57-1-2-0) |
2018-04-11 | House | House concurs |
2018-04-10 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2018-04-10 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2018-04-03 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-1-0) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COMPS Committee |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-3-3-0) |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-06 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-06 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2018-02-05 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-30 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
4 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
4 | 116.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
4 | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
4 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
4 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
4 | 203.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
4 | 203.03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
4 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
4 | 205.04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
4 | 205.08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
4 | 205.10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
4 | 205.11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
4 | 206.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
4 | 207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
4 | 210 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
4 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
4 | 243 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |