AZ HB2333 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Senate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Home-based businesses; local regulation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home-based businesses; local regulation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-12SenateSenate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0)
2018-02-28SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2018-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-23SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-22HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (36-20-4-0)
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-01-30HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-22HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-18HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-18HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2018-01-18HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11820Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9462.09New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70124
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2333p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2333h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.2333weninger.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.2333commerce.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70124&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70124&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70124&billStatusActionId=181567&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70124&billStatusActionId=181598&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70124&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2

Bill Comments

feedback