AZ HB2316 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Chapter 92
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Chapter 92
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mobile home; relocation; building codes
Title
Mobile home; relocation; building codes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House - Motion Motion by Representative Biasiucci that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), HB2316 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Motion Motion by Representative Biasiucci that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), HB2316 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Education Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House - Motion Motion by Representative Biasiucci that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), HB2316 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Motion Motion by Representative Biasiucci that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), HB2316 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Education Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Chapter 92 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-04-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-5-3-0) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate FICO Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FICO Committee |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-03-12 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (44-12-4-0) |
2024-03-12 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-12 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-04 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2024-03-04 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (19-41-0-0) |
2024-02-29 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-29 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-02-13 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | House | House COM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-3-0-1-0-0) |
2024-01-29 | House | House ED Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Arizona Teachers Academy
Building Codes
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Education - Title 15
Emergency
Mobile Homes
Private Universities
Property - Title 33
Relocation
School Employee Training
State Government - Title 41
Building Codes
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Education - Title 15
Emergency
Mobile Homes
Private Universities
Property - Title 33
Relocation
School Employee Training
State Government - Title 41
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 1476.04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 1476.05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |