AZ HB2312 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Lease cost review board; repeal

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lease cost review board; repeal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-09SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-08SenateSenate consent calendar
2021-03-08SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-03SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-2-0)
2021-02-22SenateSenate read second time
2021-02-18SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-02-18SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-02-05SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-02-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-0-0)
2021-02-04HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-02-02HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-02HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-01HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-02-01HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-27HouseHouse GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-25HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-21HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-21HouseAssigned to House GE Committee
2021-01-21HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41792Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74794
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2312p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2312h.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/481558
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/481854
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486057
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486749
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74794&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74794&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74794&billStatusActionId=200131&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74794&billStatusActionId=200170&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74794&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74794&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments 750

feedback