AZ HB2312 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Chapter 111 RFEIR
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Chapter 111 RFEIR
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amusement gambling; merchandise prize value
Title
Amusement gambling; merchandise prize value
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Farnsworth [R] | Rep. Mark Cardenas [D] | Rep. Russell Bowers [R] | Rep. Diego Espinoza [D] |
Rep. Jill Norgaard [R] | Rep. Robert Meza [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | Chapter 111 RFEIR | |
2015-03-30 | Governor Signed | |
2015-03-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-3-2-0) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-02-20 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-02-19 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (53-4-3-0) |
2015-02-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-04 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to House COM Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-27 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2015-01-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |