AZ HB2311 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Chapter 137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Limited liability; employers; ex-offenders

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limited liability; employers; ex-offenders

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05SenateChapter 137
2018-04-05SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-03-29HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-29SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-03-20SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-19SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-03-19SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-15SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-02-21SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2018-02-20SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-08SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-08HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-1-0)
2018-02-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-05HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-31HouseHouse JPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-22HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-18HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-18HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2018-01-18HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12558.03New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70091
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2311p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2311h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0137.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70091&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70091&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70091&billStatusActionId=180565&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70091&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70091&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70091&billStatusActionId=182812&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback