AZ HB2308 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Chapter 319
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Recall petitions and elections; revisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recall petitions and elections; revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-05SenateChapter 319
2021-05-05SenateGovernor Signed
2021-05-05SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-04-28HouseTransmit to House
2021-04-28SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
2021-04-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-04-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2021-03-30SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-30SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-29SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-22SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0)
2021-03-09SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-08SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-08SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2021-03-08SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-03-04SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-03-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0)
2021-02-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-17HouseHouse GE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-5-0-1-0-0)
2021-01-27HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-26HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-26HouseAssigned to House GE Committee
2021-01-26HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19202.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19204.01New CodeSee Bill Text
19205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19205.01New CodeSee Bill Text
19205.04New CodeSee Bill Text
19206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19206.01New CodeSee Bill Text
19208.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19208.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19208.03Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19208.06New CodeSee Bill Text
19209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19213Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74787
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2308p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2308h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0319.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/h.2308butler.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/h.2308kavanagh.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/h.2308government elections.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483460
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484793
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485743
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487393
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489359
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74787&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74787&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74787&billStatusActionId=201772&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74787&billStatusActionId=202771&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74787&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74787&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74787&billStatusActionId=203482&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74787&billStatusActionId=203886&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74787&billStatusActionId=203902&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback