AZ HB2307 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Chapter 305
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Chapter 305
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Voting equipment; overvote notice
Title
Voting equipment; overvote notice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Chapter 305 |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-22 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-1-1-0) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (52-0-8-0) |
2021-03-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-02-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-27 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-01-25 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-21 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |