AZ HB2307 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Senate HEWD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Senate HEWD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Continuing high school; continuing study
Title
Continuing high school; continuing study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate HEWD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HEWD Committee |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-03-19 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (50-8-2-0) |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-03-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2019-03-07 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-07 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-06 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-18 | House | House ED Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-2-1-0-0-0) |
2019-02-13 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 209 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 220 | New Code | See Bill Text |