AZ HB2307 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Arizona manufactured firearms; regulation
Title
Arizona manufactured firearms; regulation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-05 | Governor Signed | |
2010-03-30 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-03-29 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-29 | Senate third reading , voting: (22-8-0-0) | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to Senate Committee | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to Senate Committee | |
2010-02-25 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-02-24 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-02-24 | House third reading , voting: (35-23-2-0) | |
2010-02-11 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-02-08 | House Consent Calendar February 08, 2010 @ 3:15 PM with Objections | |
2010-02-09 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-09 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-08 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-28 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2010-01-26 | House read second time | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Introduced in House and read first time |