AZ HB2304 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Chapter 253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Mobile home parks; tree maintenance

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mobile home parks; tree maintenance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-17 Chapter 253
2016-05-17 Governor Signed
2016-05-06 Transmitted to Governor
2016-05-06HouseHouse final reading , voting: (35-18-7-0)
2016-05-06HouseHouse Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2016-04-18HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-04-18HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-04-13SenateTransmit to House
2016-04-13SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (23-7-0-0)
2016-03-30SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2016-03-22SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-22SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-07SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2016-02-16SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-29SenateSenate CWD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-1-0)
2016-02-17SenateReferred to Senate CWD Committee
2016-02-17SenateSenate read second time
2016-02-16SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-16SenateAssigned to Senate CWD Committee
2016-02-16SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2016-02-09HouseTransmit to Senate
2016-02-09HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (47-11-2-0)
2016-02-04HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2016-02-02HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-02HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-01HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0)
2016-01-21HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-01-27HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0-0)
2016-01-25HouseReferred to House COM Committee
2016-01-25HouseHouse read second time
2016-01-21HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-01-21HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2016-01-21HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=115&Bill_Number=HB2304
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2304p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2304h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2304s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/laws/0253.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/s.2304jd.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/2304yee1117.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2304.hcom.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2304.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2304.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2304.scwd.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2304.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2304.hfinal.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback