AZ HB2302 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Publication of notices; committee
Title
Publication of notices; committee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-20 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-19 | Senate third reading , voting: (19-9-2-0) | |
2010-04-05 | Senate Consent Calendar April 05, 2010 @ 3:05 PM | |
2010-04-15 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-15 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-05 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-1-3-0) | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-03 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-03 | House third reading , voting: (41-19-0-0) | |
2010-03-01 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-02-23 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-23 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-22 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-08 | House GOV Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2010-02-10 | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to House COM Committee | |
2010-01-20 | House read second time | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2010-02-08 | Assigned to House COM Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Introduced in House and read first time |