AZ HB2299 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-2-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

DHS; long-term care facility surveyors

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS; long-term care facility surveyors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-2-0)
2021-02-22SenateSenate read second time
2021-02-18SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-02-18SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-02-08SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-02-08HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (40-18-1-0)
2021-02-08HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-02HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-02HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-01HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-27HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-1-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-25HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-21HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-20HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-20HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2021-01-20HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2021-01-20HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74758
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2299p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2299h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/h.2299butler.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/h.2299health human services.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/481189
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/481404
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/482402
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483800
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487543
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74758&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74758&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74758&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74758&billStatusActionId=200238&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74758&billStatusActionId=200243&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74758&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback