AZ HB2297 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Water and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Water infrastructure finance program; report

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water infrastructure finance program; report

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03SenateSenate read second time
2020-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate WAG Committee
2020-03-02SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-02-27SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-26HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2020-02-24HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-24HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-24HouseHouse consent calendar
2020-02-24HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-18HouseHouse NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-27HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-22HouseAssigned to House NREW Committee
2020-01-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
491204Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback