AZ HB2296 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-12 - Senate motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Probationers; search; seizure authority

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Probationers; search; seizure authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-12SenateSenate motion to reconsider third reading
2023-04-12SenateSenate third reading FAILED voting: (15-14-1-0)
2023-03-28SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2023-03-28SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2023-03-27SenateSenate consent calendar
2023-03-27SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2023-03-23SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2023-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2023-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2023-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2023-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2023-02-21SenateTransmit to Senate
2023-02-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0)
2023-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2023-02-14HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-14HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-13HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2023-02-08HouseHouse JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-3-0-1-0-0)
2023-01-19HouseHouse read second time
2023-01-18HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2023-01-18HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2023-01-18HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
13901Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/78404
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/hb2296p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/hb2296h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/proposed/H.2296KOLODIN1.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/adopted/H.2296JUDICIARY.DOCX.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/502625
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/503263
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/503775
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/505444
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/507052
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78404&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78404&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78404&billStatusActionId=215823&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78404&billStatusActionId=215965&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78404&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78404&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78404&billStatusActionId=218528&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78404&billStatusActionId=218536&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback