AZ HB2293 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-17 - Senate final reading FAILED, voting: (15-14-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-17 - Senate final reading FAILED, voting: (15-14-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicle impoundment; exceptions; storage charges
Title
Vehicle impoundment; exceptions; storage charges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate final reading FAILED, voting: (15-14-1-0) |
2021-05-13 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (31-28-1-0) |
2021-05-13 | House | House Conference adopted |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Conference adopted |
2021-05-05 | House | House Conference caucus date |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Conference caucus date |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Senate Minority report |
2021-04-29 | House | House Minority report |
2021-04-29 | House | House Conference report: That the House accept the Senate amendments and the bill be further amended. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conference members: BORRELLI has been replaced by GOWAN |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conference members: PACE, GOWAN, QUEZADA |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conference appointed |
2021-04-14 | House | House Conference members: PAYNE, BLACKMAN, JERMAINE |
2021-04-14 | House | House Conference appointed |
2021-03-31 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2021-03-23 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2021-03-22 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (21-7-2-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (48-11-1-0) |
2021-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-01 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-1-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-26 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2021-01-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Abandoned Vehicles (h)
Exceptions
Immobilization (h)
Impoundment (h)
Storage Charges
Transportation - Title 28
Vehicle Impoundment
Exceptions
Immobilization (h)
Impoundment (h)
Storage Charges
Transportation - Title 28
Vehicle Impoundment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 3511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3512 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3514 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 4838 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |