AZ HB2288 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State licensing; fee waiver
Title
State licensing; fee waiver
Sponsors
Rep. Joanne Osborne [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Rep. Walter Blackman [R] | Sen. Frank Carroll [R] |
Rep. Tim Dunn [R] | Rep. Jay Lawrence [R] | Rep. Becky Nutt [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] |
Sen. Sine Kerr [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Military & Veterans Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Military & Veterans Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2020-02-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-03 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-27 | House | House MVA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned to House MVA Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |