AZ HB2286 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Chapter 198
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Chapter 198
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Truth in taxation; increase; notice
Title
Truth in taxation; increase; notice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Chapter 198 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-19 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-3-2-0) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-23-2-0) |
2017-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2017-02-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-08 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-18 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
County Assessors
Education
Municipalities
Property Tax
Property Tax Oversight Commission
State Government
Taxation
Truth In Taxation
Education
Municipalities
Property Tax
Property Tax Oversight Commission
State Government
Taxation
Truth In Taxation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 1461.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 905.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1276 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 17003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 17004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 17107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 254 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |