AZ HB2285 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-13 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-13 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
State budget; appropriation limitation; hearing
Title
State budget; appropriation limitation; hearing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-13 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-1-0) |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | House FFR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0-0) |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to House FFR Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned to House FFR Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |