AZ HB2284 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-06 - Chapter 374
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-06 - Chapter 374
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Search; rescue; human remains; canines
Title
Search; rescue; human remains; canines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-24 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-24 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-06 | Senate | Chapter 374 |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-24 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (49-0-11-0) |
2022-06-24 | House | House concurs |
2022-06-24 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2022-06-24 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2022-06-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-0-5-0) |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-2-0) |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0) |
2022-02-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-02-01 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-01 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-01-31 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-01-31 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-25 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-1-0-0) |
2022-01-19 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Anatomical Gifts (s)
Canines (s)
Counties - Title 11 (s)
Education - Title 15
Human Remains (s)
Public Health And Safety - Title 36 (s)
Purpose (s)
Rescue (s)
School Employees
Schools
Search (s)
Search And Rescue (s)
Student Promotions
Canines (s)
Counties - Title 11 (s)
Education - Title 15
Human Remains (s)
Public Health And Safety - Title 36 (s)
Purpose (s)
Rescue (s)
School Employees
Schools
Search (s)
Search And Rescue (s)
Student Promotions
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 701.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 702 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 808 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |